MD SB1015 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; providing the purpose of the Task Force is to study policies and procedures related to the treatment of mental illness in students, and review certain best practices and models for accessing certain mental health services; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations on certain matters; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by December 1, 2020, and a final report by December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1504 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback