MD SB1015 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the serving size of a sample serving of beer permitted to be served to an individual by a holder of a Class BWTS beer and wine tasting or sampling license in St. Mary's County; establishing a BWT beer and wine tasting permit in St. Mary's County to allow the on-premises consumption of beer and wine for tasting purposes only; providing that a person who violates a specified law is subject to license revocation or suspension and a specified civil penalty; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Permits, Training, Prohibited Acts, and Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663393/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Civil Actions
Education
Fees
Fines
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Civil Actions
Education
Fees
Fines
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County