MD SB1012 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the composition of the eight districts in the State of Maryland for the election of members to the United States House of Representatives; and requiring that a certain question be submitted to the qualified voters of the State if the Act is petitioned to referendum under Article XVI of the Maryland Constitution.
Title
Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 213922/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 213922/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2022-03-30 | House | Floor Amendment {213922/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (42-92) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-13) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted (29-13) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 8:30 a.m. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted (32-12) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 8 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |