MD SB1011 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain investor-owned gas or electric companies to require certain contractors and subcontractors to pay their employees not less than the prevailing wage rate for certain projects involving the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, restoration, or alteration of any underground gas or electric infrastructure of the company, and any related traffic control activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-27SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1048 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities5305(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement17201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback