MD SB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting certain public school construction projects that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding from certain requirements; requiring public school construction projects in Prince George's County that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding to comply with certain requirements and a certain memorandum of understanding; establishing the Prince George's County Public-Private Partnership Fund to provide funds to pay certain entities for certain payments due; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-0)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {224366/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-05HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {919037/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-27SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2019-02-27SenateMotion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Peters) Adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1011&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1011f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1011t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1011e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_387_sb1011e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb1011_91903701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb1011_22436601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb1011.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1011_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1226.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1227.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1011_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1572.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1573.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1446.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback