MD SB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in conjunction with the Office of Health Care Quality, to conduct an assessment of the services provided at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown, comparing the services currently provided to the services provided in fiscal 2015 and to identify whether, on or after July 1, 2015, any services from the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown were reduced or were transferred to the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Easton; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Eastern Shore
Examinations
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Eastern Shore
Examinations
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Reports
State Universities and Colleges