MD SB1010 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, except as prohibited by federal law, a provision in certain employment contracts, policies, or agreements that waive certain rights or remedies to a claim of sexual harassment or certain retaliation is null and void as being against the public policy of the State; requiring employers with 50 or more employees to submit a certain survey to the Commission on Civil Rights; requiring the Commission to make the survey responses accessible to the public by posting certain information on the Commission's website; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 739
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (136-1)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseDelegates Valderrama, Aumann, and Clippinger
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenators Klausmeier, Benson, and Reilly
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {603498/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {697172/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1010&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1010f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1010t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1010e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1010_69717201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1010_60349801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1010_42302701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1010_73332201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb1010.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1010_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0722.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1010_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1176.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1010_73332201.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1464.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1540.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback