MD SB1008 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a fire department, a rescue squad, or an ambulance service from conducting a criminal history records check or requiring an applicant to disclose criminal records before the applicant's first in-person interview; requiring each fire department, rescue squad, and ambulance service to establish a certain peer review committee; and establishing the duties of a peer review committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-10SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB586 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety6306(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback