MD SB1006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a condition relating to an incarcerated obligor's term of imprisonment under which the obligor's child support payment is not considered past due and arrearages will not accrue if the obligor was sentenced to a term of imprisonment of 180 consecutive calendar days or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (102-32)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-21)
2020-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {202111/1 Adopted
2020-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-03-16HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-26SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-26SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law12104.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback