MD SB1006 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of the construction practice term "Coast Smart" to include highway facilities; requiring the Coast Smart Council, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Transportation, to establish Coast Smart siting and design criteria to address sea level rise inundation and coastal flood impacts on State and local projects; requiring a local jurisdiction that experiences nuisance flooding to develop a plan to address the flooding by July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-7) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-41) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {120611/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {263826/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Motion Return Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture, Department of
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture, Department of
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning