MD SB1005 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to review investment holdings in certain eligible accounts to determine the extent to which funds are invested in Russia-restricted investments; requiring the Board of Trustees to take certain divestment actions; prohibiting the Board of Trustees from making certain new investments; providing certain immunities from liability for certain persons; requiring the Board of Trustees to act in good faith in taking certain actions in a certain manner; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {233626/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 12:45 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 10:45 a.m. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Federal Government
International Affairs
Investments
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Federal Government
International Affairs
Investments
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 123.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |