MD SB1005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county, before the transfer of an asset of the county as part of the development of a high-speed transportation system that passes through the county, if the asset is located in a municipality, to negotiate a certain written agreement with the municipality concerning the approval by and financial remuneration to the municipality.
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Counties - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Personal Property
Railroads
Real Property
Counties - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Personal Property
Railroads
Real Property