MD SB1005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB924
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified owner of a mobile home park to provide written notice of any increase in the annual rent for a site to a specified resident, a specified homeowners association, and the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General at least 90 days before the effective date of the increase; authorizing an increase in annual rent to exceed an increase in a specified index only under specified circumstances; requiring a park owner to schedule a specified meeting and provide specified information; etc.
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Attorney General
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Real Property
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Real Property