MD SB1003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology to include the permitting of data sharing and integration among specified units of State government; establishing the Management Intelligence Incentive Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to submit with the State budget specified information about the Fund and projects supported by the Fund; authorizing specified State units to request specified project funding from the Fund; etc.
Title
Department of Information Technology - Data Sharing and Integration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Governor
Interest
Investments
Prices
Privacy
Public Broadcasting Commission
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Governor
Interest
Investments
Prices
Privacy
Public Broadcasting Commission
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of