MD SB1001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue on the sale or use of certain digital products to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained electronically by the buyer or delivered by certain means; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the retail sale of a certain digital code or digital product shall be presumed to be made in the state in which a certain customer tax address is located; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st–Century Economy Fairness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFloor Committee Amendment {149233/3 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {999231/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {999231/1
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-04SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-18SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB932 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11217(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11221(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General21302.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback