MD SB1001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the entities for which the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is required to waive a certain filing fee; designating the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board as a body politic and corporate and an instrumentality of the State; providing that, except under certain circumstances, the Board is not subject to any law that affects governmental units; authorizing the appointing authority, rather than the Governor, to remove a member of the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board; etc.
Title
Employee Benefits – State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-44) (Y: 91 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-44) (Y: 91 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-44) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553995/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {169534/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Health Insurance
Insurance
Nonprofit Organizations
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Retirement Systems
Small Business
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Welfare
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Health Insurance
Insurance
Nonprofit Organizations
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Retirement Systems
Small Business
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Welfare