MD SB1000 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline for the Board of Directors of Walker Mill Development, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; providing that the grant may not terminate before June 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Walker Mill Daycare and Training Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |