MD SB1000 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to select a specified number of members of the State Racing Commission from a list provided by specified associations and from specified members of the public at large; requiring the Governor to select the chair of the State Racing Commission in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - State Racing Commission - Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB1000.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb1000f.pdf |