MD SB100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to designate the authority to approve certain reservoir, dam, or waterway obstruction plans and specifications; and requiring the Department's designee to notify the Department of the approval of certain ponds.
Title
Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |