MD SB10 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from carrying or displaying a firearm on the premises of a privately or publicly owned building being used as a polling site during an election, including in a parking lot, or carrying or possessing a firearm within 100 feet of a polling site during an election, subject to certain exceptions; and establishing a certain civil penalty of up to $5,000 for a certain violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Floor Amendment 423023/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-11HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2021-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-09SenateFloor Amendment {174831/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
2021-03-09SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
2021-03-05SenateMotion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
2021-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-04SenateFloor Amendment {423023/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (17-30)
2021-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {114131/1 Adopted
2021-03-03SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted
2021-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {114131/1
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-19SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-23SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB450 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law161002(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law16903(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law16904(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback