MD HJ9 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the sharp disagreement of the General Assembly of Maryland with the repeal of the Affordable Care Act; urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act that ensure all Marylanders have access to affordable health insurance coverage, free from discriminatory rates and policies; and urging the Governor of Maryland to join in urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect specified provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-50) (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {533222/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-90) (Y: 50 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (34-13)
2017-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-04-05SenateHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (90-50)
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {533222/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-90)
2017-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {953620/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2017-03-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hj0009&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hj/hj0009f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hj/hj0009t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/JR_5_hj0009t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hj0009_53322201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hj0009_95362001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hj0009.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hj0009_hru.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hj0009_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hj0009,h-0484&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hj0009,h-0590&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hj0009,s-1433&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback