MD HJ6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJ2
Note: Carry Over of previous HJ6
Note: Carry Over of previous HJ6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose amendments to the U.S. Constitution that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for officials of the federal government and for the members of the U.S. Congress.
Title
United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsors
Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] |
Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
Del. Teresa Reilly [R] | Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Del. Brenda Thiam [R] | Del. William Wivell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HJ6 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
SJ8 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HJ6 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
SJ8 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HJ6 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Subjects
Constitution, U.S.
Executive Orders
Federal Government
Jurisdiction
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Executive Orders
Federal Government
Jurisdiction
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HJ0006?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hj/hj0006f.pdf |