MD HJ3 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the compensation of the members of the Maryland Court of Appeals, the Maryland Court of Special Appeals, the circuit courts, and the District Court of Maryland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-31) (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {133221/2 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (41-88) (Y: 42 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
2018-03-13HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (42-2)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (105-31)
2018-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-22HouseFloor Amendment {133221/2 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (41-88)
2018-02-21HouseSpecial Order until 2/22 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted
2018-02-20HouseSpecial Order until 2/21 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {214467/2 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hj0003&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hj/hj0003f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hj/hj0003t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/JR_3_hj0003t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hj0003_21446702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hj0003_13322102.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hj0003.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hj0003_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0114.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0164.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hj0003_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0497.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback