MD HJ2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing certain evidence showing a deficiency in the gender diversity of Maryland boardrooms and the comparative high performance of companies where women are more strongly represented in top management; encouraging equitable and diverse gender representation on the boards and in senior management of companies and organizations in the State of Maryland; and urging certain institutions and companies to have a minimum of 30% of women directors by December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing Maryland's Competitiveness Through Gender Diversity in Boardrooms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseUnfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback