MD HJ2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing certain evidence showing a deficiency in the gender diversity of Maryland boardrooms and the comparative high performance of companies where women are more strongly represented in top management; encouraging equitable and diverse gender representation on the boards and in senior management of companies and organizations in the State of Maryland; and urging certain institutions and companies to have a minimum of 30% of women directors by December 31, 2021; etc.
Title
Increasing Maryland's Competitiveness Through Gender Diversity in Boardrooms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |