MD HJ11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designating March 13 as Women Veterans Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Women Veterans Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Sample-Hughes) Adopted (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateHearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {603527/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseReferred House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Sample-Hughes) Adopted (134-0)
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback