MD HJ11 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that authorizes regulation of contributions and expenditures intended to influence elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment

Sponsors

Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]
Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]
Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-42) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (94-42)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {993427/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback