MD HJ10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the opposition of the General Assembly to the drastic cuts to the funding of the Chesapeake Bay Program and specified other programs proposed by the President of the United States in the federal budget blueprint for fiscal year 2018; urging the Governor to publicly oppose the drastic cuts proposed by the President to the funding of specified programs; and requiring specified committees of the General Assembly to monitor and make recommendations regarding federal budget proposals and actions affecting the Chesapeake Bay.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-9) (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barve) Adopted (109-26) (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barve) Adopted (109-26) (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-9) |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183121/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 10:00 a.m. |
2017-04-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-05 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Barve) Adopted (109-26) |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
General Assembly
Governor
Natural Resources - Generally
State Government - General Assembly
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
General Assembly
Governor
Natural Resources - Generally
State Government - General Assembly