MD HJ1 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the government of the Republic of Turkey to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights, cease discrimination against the Ecumenical Patriarch of the Orthodox Christian Church, grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate recognition, ecclesiastic succession, and the right to train specified clergy, and respect specified human and property rights; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Turkish Treatment of the Ecumenical Patriarchate and the Ecumenical Patriarch

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2010-03-03 Hearing 3/8 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-01-13 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2009-10-26 Pre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback