MD HB999 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a process for an electric cooperative to operate as a member-regulated cooperative in a certain area; requiring a cooperative's board of directors to hold a certain meeting and forums and provide a certain notice and information to the cooperative's members on whether to operate as a member-regulated cooperative; requiring a member-regulated cooperative to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the status of the deployment of broadband Internet service to the cooperative's members; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (126-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB540 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations5601(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5607(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5632(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5635(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5636(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5637(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5638(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5639(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5640(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5641(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5642(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5643(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5644(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5648(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2112(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback