MD HB999 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a process for an electric cooperative to operate as a member-regulated cooperative in a certain area; specifying that the Public Service Commission does not have jurisdiction over a member-regulated cooperative, subject to certain exceptions; prohibiting a member-regulated cooperative from exercising a certain power of condemnation for the sole purpose of providing broadband Internet service; specifying certain provisions of law that apply to a member-regulated cooperative; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (126-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {677073/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {693896/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB540 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations5601(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5607(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5632(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5635(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5636(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5637(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5638(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5639(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5640(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5641(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5642(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5643(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5644(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5647(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2112(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback