MD HB998 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to submit a certain annual report to the General Assembly; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $1,000,000 from the Board of Physicians Fund to the Program if the Governor does not include the funds in the State budget in fiscal year 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {183120/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {604166/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {604166/1
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB501 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education182801(n/a)See Bill Text
Education182802(n/a)See Bill Text
Education182803(n/a)See Bill Text
Education182804(n/a)See Bill Text
Education182805(n/a)See Bill Text
Education182806(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241701(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241702(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241703(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241704(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241705(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241706(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General241707(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14207(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations15206(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback