MD HB997 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention; requiring the Task Force to study certain issues related to veterans' suicide in the State; requiring the Task Force to coordinate and communicate with certain groups in completing a certain study; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before certain dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback