MD HB995 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Anne Arundel County; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the Sheriff while serving in a term of office beginning before the effective date of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (129-2)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-06HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings2315(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback