MD HB994 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain exemption from certain insurance laws for certain voluntary noncontractual religious publication arrangements; exempting from certain insurance laws certain health care sharing ministries; requiring a person to obtain a certificate of registration from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to act as a health care sharing ministry in the State; requiring the Commissioner to send a notice of an impending expiration of a certificate of registration not later than 30 days before the expiration; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-18HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB697 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance1202(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance27402(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8701(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8702(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8703(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8704(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8705(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8706(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance8707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback