MD HB993 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the compensation of the members of the Montgomery County Board of Education; authorizing a student member to elect to receive certain compensation at a certain time; and providing for the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateMotion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-2)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education3902(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback