MD HB991 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the use of qualified conservation in a forest mitigation bank of all or a part of certain existing forests as a standard for meeting certain afforestation or reforestation requirements; altering the defined term "forest mitigation banking" to include the qualified conservation of forests; requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology, in consultation with certain entities, to conduct a certain technical study; establishing the Urban Trees Program to be administered by the Chesapeake Bay Trust; etc.
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-38) |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment {953823/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {594438/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-8) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {570516/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Construction
Counties
Easements
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Examinations
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Records
Reports
Sunset
Trees
Urban Areas
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Construction
Counties
Easements
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Examinations
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Records
Reports
Sunset
Trees
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 8 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 1607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 1610.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 1911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 2A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 2A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |