MD HB991 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "qualifying not-for-profit organization", for purposes of provisions of law that authorize specified qualifying not-for-profit organizations to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program, to include a corporation, a limited liability company, or any other entity wholly owned by the Legal Aid Bureau, Inc.; etc.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-2) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Corporations
Health
Legal Aid
Limited Liability Companies
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Welfare
Health
Legal Aid
Limited Liability Companies
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Welfare