MD HB989 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a hospital to provide certain instructions to the parent or legal guardian of an infant before the hospital discharges the infant into the care of the parent or legal guardian; requiring a hospital before discharging an infant to inquire as to whether a parent or legal guardian is able to provide the infant with a certain environment and a certain item, inform a parent or legal guardian of certain matters, and provide each parent or legal guardian with a certain form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB944 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19308.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback