MD HB986 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the contents of a certain report required by the Department of Human Services regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1 each year, to report to the General Assembly and the Department of Human Services certain information regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Child Welfare System - Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB662 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law51312(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback