MD HB985 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (29-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State's Attorney to certify that a conviction was in error under certain circumstances; altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined on a finding of eligibility by an administrative law judge within 90 days after receiving the order; requiring certain compensation made by the Board to be equal to a certain amount; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed (The Walter Lomax Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 653729/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator Young) Adopted (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Reconsider (Senator Young) Adopted (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Rejected (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (29-15)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {103621/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
2020-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {653729/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-28)
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2020-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment {968576/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateMotion Limit Debate (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Reconsider (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Limit Debate (Senator King) Rejected (28-15)
2020-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment {968576/1
2020-03-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {968576/1
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (123-9)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFloor Committee Amendment {642218/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseMotion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {992510/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB797 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure8201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10501(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10502(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10503(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91604(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0985?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0985f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0985t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0985_99251001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0985_64221801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0985_96857601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0985_10362101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0985_65372901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0985_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0985_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0839.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1052.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1053.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1054.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1055.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback