MD HB984 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to ensure that providers of and individuals who receive certain services are not negatively impacted when using a certain software system or function; requiring that an individual receiving certain services who receives a certain notice have 30 days to appeal a certain eligibility determination; requiring certain services to continue uninterrupted under certain circumstances until the outcome of a certain appeal is complete; etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Program Changes and Required Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {686083/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB796 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Communications
Developmental Disabilities
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Notices
Postal Service
Public Health
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Appeals
Communications
Developmental Disabilities
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Notices
Postal Service
Public Health
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |