MD HB984 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the County Commissioners of Carroll County to distribute certain funds to rescue and emergency medical services companies in addition to fire companies, subject to a certain plan; authorizing the County Commissioners to award certain service award payments to members of rescue and emergency medical services companies in addition to fire companies; requiring the County Commissioners under certain circumstances to establish an Emergency Services Advisory Council for a certain purpose; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback