MD HB983 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose of the Heritage Conservation Fund to include acquiring interests in land that can be used by the general public for hunting; establishing the Wildlife Conservation, Education, and Outreach Program to provide outreach and foster an interest in outdoor recreation and stewardship, hunting, and wildlife conservation; establishing a stamp for hunting sika deer; authorizing a nonresident attending a college or university in the State to purchase a resident hunting license; etc.
Title
Hunting, Wildlife Conservation, and Outdoor Recreation - Funding, Promotion, Management, Licenses, Permits, and Stamps
Sponsors
Del. Nick Allen [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Jeffrie Long [D] |
Del. Natalie Ziegler [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-9) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {763422/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB327 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Conservation
Education
Fees
Higher Education
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Liability
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Primary Schools
Private Schools
Public Schools
Real Property
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Trapping
Trespass
Wildlands
Birds
Conservation
Education
Fees
Higher Education
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Liability
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Primary Schools
Private Schools
Public Schools
Real Property
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Trapping
Trespass
Wildlands
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |