MD HB983 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop certain guidelines relating to the restrictions on personal and compassionate care visitation that a nursing home may impose to reduce the spread of COVID-19 or another disease that constitutes a catastrophic health emergency; declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly that during a catastrophic health emergency visitation in nursing homes be prioritized to balance the physical needs of the residents with the mental and spiritual needs of the residents; etc.
Title
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Sponsors
Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {166187/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Boundaries
Caregivers
COVID-19
Diseases
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nursing Homes
Personal Protective Equipment
Public Health
Safety
Vulnerable Adults
Caregivers
COVID-19
Diseases
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nursing Homes
Personal Protective Equipment
Public Health
Safety
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1410.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |