MD HB983 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, under certain circumstances, the personal representative or guardian of the last remaining member of a limited liability company shall automatically be admitted as a new member, unless a certain action is taken; authorizing certain persons to wind up the affairs of a limited liability company in certain circumstances; authorizing a court to wind up the affairs of a limited liability company on the application of certain persons under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493396/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB888 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Parents and Guardians
Partnerships
Personal Representatives
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Parents and Guardians
Partnerships
Personal Representatives
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 10 | 7A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 12 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 9A | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |