MD HB983 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the health care services delivered through telehealth under health insurance to include counseling for substance use disorders; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2017.
Title
Health Insurance - Health Care Services Delivered Through Telehealth - Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {626783/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contracts
Counselors
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Counselors
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones