MD HB981 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the frequency of the sessions of the Orphans' Court in Cecil County to be every Tuesday for the transaction of the business of the Court, and more often if need be, according to its own adjournment.
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |