MD HB980 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "taxpayer" as the owner of residential or commercial property who purchases and installs an energy storage system or an individual who owns or pays for the installation of an energy storage system that supplies energy for use on a residential or commercial property; providing a credit against the State income tax for the costs of installing an energy storage system; increasing from $75,000 to $150,000 the maximum tax credit certificate that may be issued for the installation of an energy storage system on certain property; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Energy Storage Tax Credit - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-04SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (108-29)
2020-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {455963/1 Adopted
2020-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB775 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10719(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback