MD HB98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-22)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State to continue providing a certain prescription drug benefit plan to certain retirees by repealing the January 1, 2019, termination of a certain State prescription drug benefit plan for certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children under certain circumstances; authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a spouse or dependent child to elect to have the spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; etc.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Participation in the State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Drugs
Health
Medical Assistance
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Welfare
Health
Medical Assistance
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Welfare